Torres Jimenez, Monica (CPSO#: 83417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
585 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 4S4
Phone: (519) 578-7484
Fax: (519) 579-2432
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Torres-Jimenez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Torres Jimenez ( CPSO# 83417 )

Business Address:
301 - 585 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 4S4
Phone Number: (519) 578-7484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA TORRES JIMENEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORRES JIMENEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 22 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2011