Torres, Monica Maria (CPSO#: 87220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 Mill St, Suite 202
Georgetown ON  L7G 2C5
Phone: 9057021112
Fax: 9057021114
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica M. Torres Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Torres ( CPSO# 87220 )

Business Address:
118 Mill Street
Suite 202
Georgetown ON  L7G 2C5
Phone Number: (905) 702-1112

Business Address:
719 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 270-3636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA MARIA TORRES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORRES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014