Torres-Trejo, Alejandro (CPSO#: 97475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Polytechnic Institute, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York
USA - North Dakota
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - South Dakota
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Alejandro  Torres-Trejo  may practise medicine independently in neurology,
            only.