Torti, Margherita (CPSO#: 76007)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Rome, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 May 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2004