Touma, Zahi (CPSO#: 87320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2014

Expiry Date:  10 Mar 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Touma, Zahi Nabih (used until: 23 May 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kursk State Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 1 415 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5248
Fax: (416) 603-9387
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Apr 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Zahi Touma may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Rheumatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Touma
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Touma  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Touma's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Touma's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on March 11, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 10, 2021.