Trail, Carla Nadine (CPSO#: 84886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LGC Family Health Team
2235 Parkdale Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 6B2
Phone: (613) 342-4076
Fax: (613) 342-6578
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maple View Lodge
746 County Road 42 East
Athens ON  K0E 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 924-2696
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

375 James Street
Gananoque ON  K7G2Z1
Canada
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carla Trail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trail ( CPSO# 84886 )

Business Address:
Maple View Lodge
746 County Road 42 East
Athens ON  K0E 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 924-2696

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
CPHC
2235 Parkdale Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 6B2
Phone Number: (613) 342-4076

Business Address:
375 James Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 2Z1
Phone Number: (613) 382-4752

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA NADINE TRAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008