Trambakoulos, Dimitra (CPSO#: 79045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 466-4290
Fax: (416) 466-4393
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRA TRAMBAKOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAMBAKOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005