Tran, Anh Thi Ngoc (CPSO#: 89012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 26
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone: (905) 761-5482
Fax: (905) 761-0523
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anh Ngoc Thi Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tran ( CPSO# 89012 )

Business Address:
Unit 26
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: (905) 761-5482

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANH THI NGOC TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010