Tran, Christopher Shi-Jie (CPSO#: 95956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Box 215
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 88333
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SHI-JIE TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016