Tran, Duy (CPSO#: 94459)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2011