Tran, Hong Phuc Le (CPSO#: 76848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343A Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone: (613) 235-7000
Fax: (613) 235-0777
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 4, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Hong Phuc Le Tran in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Tran has given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                         DR. HONG PHUC LE TRAN
                                             ("Dr. Tran")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended

                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tran, certificate of registration number 76848, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that the College received information regarding
                  my prescribing of narcotics and initiated an investigation bearing File
                  Number 104900.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   I, Dr. Tran, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Tran's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.




            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of seven (7) months on the terms set
                        out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon recommendation
                        of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                  (c)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Tran, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of two (2) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Tran, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every two (2) weeks to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review  there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                                          1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                          2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                          3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                                Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                                                Drugs where the patient is also prescribed
                                                a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                                Preparation,
                                          or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                                          review there are not 10 patients listed in the
                                          Prescribing Log to whom I have initiated a new
                                          prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                          Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                                          and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                                          Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                          prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                          Preparation, then the charts of all patients
                                          listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                                          Supervisor's prior review. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two (2) weeks.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that after a minimum of two (2) months of
                        Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  
                  Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Tran, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of two (2) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Tran, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review  there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                                          1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                          2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                          3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                                Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                                                Drugs where the patient is also prescribed
                                                a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                                Preparation,
                                          or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                                          review there are not 10 patients listed in the
                                          Prescribing Log to whom I have initiated a new
                                          prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                          Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                                          and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                                          Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                          prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                          Preparation, then the charts of all patients
                                          listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                                          Supervisor's prior review. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that after a minimum of two (2) months of
                        Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  
                  Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")
                  
                  (m)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Tran, undertake to engage in Phase 3 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of three (3) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (n)   During Phase 3, I, Dr. Tran, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every three (3) months to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review  there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                                          1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                          2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                          3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                                Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                                                Drugs where the patient is also prescribed
                                                a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                                Preparation,
                                          or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                                          review there are not 10 patients listed in the
                                          Prescribing Log to whom I have initiated a new
                                          prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                          Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                                          and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                                          Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                          prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                          Preparation, then the charts of all patients
                                          listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                                          Supervisor's prior review. 
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every (3) months.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that after a minimum of three (3) months
                        of Phase 3, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                        the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                        College that the Clinical Supervision cease. 
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        Location approved by the College;
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the independent opinion provider dated May 26, 2017, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (x)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (y)   I, Dr. Tran, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(w) and/or (x)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (z)   I, Dr. Tran, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (7)(y) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tran, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course:
                              http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                  
                        (iii) Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                          1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
               
               
                          2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                Non-Cancer Pain:
                                http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
               
                          3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
               
                          4.    the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                Non-Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp
               
                    (iv)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the CPSO
                          Policy "Medical Records":
                          http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
                          and 
               
                    (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                          Clinical Supervisor(s).
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Tran, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                    successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                    specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                    participant assessment reports where available, within one (1) month
                    of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College will
                    determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                    completed each element of the Professional Education.
               
               (c)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                    the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                    Professional Education.
               
         (9)   Reassessment of Practice

               (a)  I, Dr. Tran, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                    Clinical Supervision set out under section 7 of the Undertaking has
                    ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                    assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").

               (b)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include
                    a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview of me,
                    interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                    and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
               
               (c)  I, Dr. Tran, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                    conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
               
               (d)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                    may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                    discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                    Reassessment.  
               
               (e)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                    be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                    Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
               
         (10)  Monitoring 

               (a)  I, Dr. Tran, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                    Location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                    limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                    jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                    (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                    further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                    Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                    that Location.
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Tran, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                    interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                    and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                    monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
               
               (c)  I, Dr. Tran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                    appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"),
                    the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System
                    ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act,
                    2010 and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                    information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                    the provisions of this Undertaking. 
               
               (d)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                    consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                    respectively. 
               
         C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

         (11)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
               this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

         (12)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
               of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
               implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

         (13)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
               provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
               counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
               right to do so.

         (14)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
               to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
               any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

         (15)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
               Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
               incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
               the Discipline Committee of the College.

         (16)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
               conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
               purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

         (17)  Public Register

               (a)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                    Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                    the Public Register.
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Tran, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                    posted in accordance with the section above, the following summary
                    shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that
                    this Undertaking remains in effect:
               
                    The College received information about Dr. Tran's prescribing of
                    narcotics.
               
                    Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                    investigation into whether Dr. Tran failed to maintain the standard
                    of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his
                    prescribing of narcotics.  As a result of the investigation:
               
                          *     Dr. Tran's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                                preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and
                                other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs
                                will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable
                                to the College for minimum of seven (7) months. 
               
                          *     Dr. Tran will engage in professional education in the
                                prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                narcotics.
               
                          *     Following the professional education and period of
                                supervision, Dr. Tran's prescribing of controlled
                                substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by
                                an assessor selected by the College.
               
         D.    CONSENT

         (18)  I, Dr. Tran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
               following information to any person who requires this information for the
               purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
               to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

               (a)  any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                    entering into this Undertaking;
               
               (b)  any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                    of, my practice; and 
               
               (c)  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                    this Undertaking.
               
         (19)  I, Dr. Tran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
               Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
               circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
               arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

         (20)  I, Dr. Tran, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
               completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
               Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
               and to one another, any information:

               (a)  relevant to this Undertaking;
               
               (b)  relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                    set out at Schedule "E";
               
               (c)  relevant to the Reassessment;
               
               (d)  relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                    Undertaking; and/or 
               
               (e)  which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                    Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                    indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
               
               

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hong Phuc Le Tran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Tran’s prescribing of narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Tran failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Tran’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of seven (7) months.

Dr. Tran will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Tran’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.