Tran, Kim-Chi Doan (CPSO#: 93629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Ave E
Unit 314
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 293-6627
Fax: (416) 293-7362
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kim-Chi Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tran ( CPSO# 93629 )

Business Address:
4190 Finch Avenue East
Unit 314
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-6627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 05 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM-CHI DOAN TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015