Tran, Maithy Ngoc (CPSO#: 86568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Mile Walk In Clinic
Unit 152
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: (416) 285-7574
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Integra Health Centre
1320-130 King St. W
(accepting rheum referrals here)
Toronto ON  M5X 2A2
Canada
Phone: 416-777-9355
Fax: 416-777-9365
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Integra Health Centre
Suite 1320
130 King St. W
(now accepting rheum referrals)
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Z7
Canada
Phone: 416-777-9355
Fax: 416-777-9365
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maithy Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tran ( CPSO# 86568 )

Business Address:
Integra Health Centre
130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8

Business Address:
103 - 56 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 3Z7
Phone Number: (416) 748-5656

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Golden Mile Walk-In Clinic
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAITHY NGOC TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012