Treasurer, Haren M (CPSO#: 79100)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Treasurer, Haren Mahesh (used until: 29 Aug 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haren Treasurer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Clinic, Unit 10, 680 Rexdale Boulevard, Etobicoke, ON M9W 0B5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015