Treki, Ibrahim Mustafa (CPSO#: 75558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3335 Dougall Ave
unit 101
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone: (519)250-9119
Fax: (519) 250-9779
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: (519)254-2469
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Treki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013


Corporation Name: Treki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Treki ( CPSO# 75558 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (226) 344-0097

Business Address:
101 - 3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 250-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2001 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ibrahim  Mustafa  Treki  may  practise  medicine independently in internal
            medicine including endocrinology, only.