Treleaven, Darin James (CPSO#: 69394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33261
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Treleaven Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Treleaven ( CPSO# 69394 )
Dr. K. Fitzpatrick ( CPSO# 69393 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIN JAMES TRELEAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRELEAVEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2000