Tremblay, Joey Edward Joseph (CPSO#: 91481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lady Minto Hospital
241 Eighth Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-7200
Fax: (705) 258-2624
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.E. Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tremblay ( CPSO# 91481 )

Business Address:
Lady Minto Hospital
241 Eighth Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 272-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEY EDWARD JOSEPH TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012