Trenholm, Richard Locksley (CPSO#: 75187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Harrold and Richard Trenholm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Harrold ( CPSO# 73661 )
Dr. R. Trenholm ( CPSO# 75187 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (708) 788-3623

Business Address:
367 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 5
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H6
Phone Number: (705) 789-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD LOCKSLEY TRENHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRENHOLM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002