Tretina, Zora (CPSO#: 42080)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Nov-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Masaryk University of Brno, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015