Trevail, Michael James (CPSO#: 95841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Trevail & C. Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trevail ( CPSO# 95841 )
Dr. C. Barrett ( CPSO# 95849 )

Business Address:
Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Business Address:
Suite 201
1807 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 433-4330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES TREVAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREVAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013