Trinkaus, Mateya Elizabeth (CPSO#: 81054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stoufville Hospital
Suite 306
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7072
Fax: (905) 472-0529
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mateya Trinkaus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trinkaus ( CPSO# 81054 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 306
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATEYA ELIZABETH TRINKAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINKAUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008