Trinos, Baieruss M (CPSO#: 90449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
Sinai Health System
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 3700
Fax: (416) 470-6722
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex
Continuing Care
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 2000
Fax: (416) 530-2470
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baieruss Trinos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trinos ( CPSO# 90449 )

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAIERUSS M TRINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011