Trochimchuk, Teegan Marie (CPSO#: 86278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Superior Family Health Organization
Unit 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Trochimchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Trochimchuk ( CPSO# 86278 )

Business Address:
Superior Health Organization
Unit 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 344-8475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEEGAN MARIE TROCHIMCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROCHIMCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010