Truong, Francoise (CPSO#: 89986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58686
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francoise Truong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 13 2013


Corporation Name: Francoise Truong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Truong ( CPSO# 89986 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOISE TRUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008