Truong, Pauline Thi-Le-Tien (CPSO#: 64515)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Regional Cancer Program 800 Commissioners Rd E London, ON N6A 5W9 Tel: 519-685-8600
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018