Trusdale, Paisley Winslow (CPSO#: 86451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Emergency Department
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5420
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

658 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Canada
Phone: 705-450-5339
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paisley Winslow Trusdale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Trusdale ( CPSO# 86451 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Emergency Department
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 260-0055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAISLEY WINSLOW TRUSDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUSDALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2009