Tsafnat, Tamar (CPSO#: 73511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mitchell Family Doctors
P O Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Downie St, Stratford, ON
Stratford ON  N5A 7K4
Canada
Phone: 519-271-7600 Ext. 267
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schieldrop Tsafnat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tsafnat ( CPSO# 73511 )
Dr. P. Schieldrop ( CPSO# 74042 )

Business Address:
10 Downie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 7K4
Phone Number: (519) 271-7600

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8200

Business Address:
Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
P.O. Box 790
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 348-8402

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMAR TSAFNAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAFNAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001