Tsakiridis, Theodoros (CPSO#: 76624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 64704
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theodoros Tsakiridis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tsakiridis ( CPSO# 76624 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 309-7167

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODOROS TSAKIRIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAKIRIDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2006