Tsang, Derek Siu Chung (CPSO#: 95166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-2121
Fax: 416-946-2111
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Gamma Knife Centre
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5445
Fax: 416-603-5155
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK SIU CHUNG TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2017