Tsao, Pamela Lih-Pin (CPSO#: 95957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Unionville Gate
Suite 102
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone: 905-305-8687
Fax: 905-305-8685
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Tsao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tsao ( CPSO# 95957 )

Business Address:
10 Unionville Gate
Suite 102
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone Number: (905) 305-8687

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA LIH-PIN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015