Tsao, Smiley Gwo-Shyong (CPSO#: 59619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
10 Unionville Gate
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone: (905) 305-8687
Fax: (905) 305-8685
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smiley Tsao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tsao ( CPSO# 59619 )

Business Address:
102 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone Number: (905) 305-8687

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SMILEY GWO-SHYONG TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989