Tse, Darren Patrick Chun Yin (CPSO#: 88363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
530 Fred St
Suite F
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-3774
Fax: (613) 667-2899
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren Tse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tse ( CPSO# 88363 )

Business Address:
F - 530 Fred Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-3774

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Parkdale
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN PATRICK CHUN YIN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013