Tse, Leonard Waye Han (CPSO#: 71371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: (905) 497-2255
Fax: (905) 497-2261
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital, WOHS
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3400
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Integrated Healthcare Centre, VDMC
6175 Highway 7, Units 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Canada
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke General Hospital, WOHS
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 204
178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Canada
Phone: 905-455-4414
Fax: 905-455-4407
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonard Tse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tse ( CPSO# 71371 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4

Business Address:
Unit 105
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-2255

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
6175 Highway 7
Unit 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 850-3091

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD WAYE HAN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008