Tseng, Chia-Lin (CPSO#: 93376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
T Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIA-LIN TSENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016