Tsikata, Setorme Adzo (CPSO#: 83381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga

Education:Kwame Nkrumah University of Sc & Tech, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
505 Queen Street
Spruce Grove AB  T7X 2V2
Phone: (780) 962-2001 Ext. 225
Fax: (780) 962-8176

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Ghana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SETORME ADZO TSIKATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIKATA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2005 to 05 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006