Tsuji, Matthew Ronald Shoji (CPSO#: 93430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2B
194 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J2
Phone: (905) 404-6611
Fax: (905) 404-6612
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Tsuji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsuji ( CPSO# 93430 )

Business Address:
2B - 194 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J2
Phone Number: (905) 404-6611

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW RONALD SHOJI TSUJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015