Tu, David Thomas (CPSO#: 72522)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2010