Tu, Hin Yu Vincent (CPSO#: 95356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 853-7468 Ext. 0
Fax: (905) 836-9038
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tu Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tu ( CPSO# 95356 )
Dr. J. Li ( CPSO# 97827 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 419
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 906-2215

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIN YU VINCENT TU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016