Tucker, Eric Clinton (CPSO#: 18536)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1982
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Mar 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2007

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2000
Summary:

 On October 18, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tucker(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct, in that he had been found guilty of an offence, in relation to 
 his prescribing of controlled substances, that is relevant to his suitability to practice 
 medicine.  In addition, he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, in 
 that he resigned membership from the California Medical Board in the face of allegations relating 
 to his prescribing of controlled substances.

The Discipline Committee ordered a recorded 
 reprimand, and a six-month suspension, three months of which will be suspended if he gives up most 
 of his narcotic prescribing privileges (he will be permitted to prescribe small dosages of 
 codeine).

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 18, 2000

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 6, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

1. I, Dr. Eric Clinton Tucker, hereby resign from the College effective July 6, 2007 at 5:00 p.m.

2. I hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario.

4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations that I am incompetent and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, on the basis of an expert report and a Physician Review and Enhancement Program ("PREP"), the College has in its possession. The expert report concluded that I failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment. The PREP report assessed me as functioning at the lowest level: Level 5-Critical Deficiency-Immediate Risk to Patient Safety.

7. I acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.