Tudor, Manuela Georgeta (CPSO#: 81369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph North End Family Medical
211-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 780-0375
Fax: (519)780-0080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manuela G. Tudor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tudor ( CPSO# 81369 )

Business Address:
Guelph North End Family Medical
211 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 780-0375

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANUELA GEORGETA TUDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUDOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006