Tugalev, Oleg (CPSO#: 78078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Donetsk Medical Institute, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Broadway St.
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3R2
Phone: 519-432-1919 Ext. 115
Fax: 519-432-9529
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

355 Wellington, Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Canada
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 519-432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oleg Tugalev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Tugalev ( CPSO# 78078 )
Dr. E. Tugaleva ( CPSO# 79796 )

Business Address:
35 Springbank Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 7P6
Phone Number: (519) 537-6147

Business Address:
355 Wellington
Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEG TUGALEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUGALEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011