Tulbah, Maha Ismail Mohammed (CPSO#: 79944)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005