Tulloch, Trisha Dee-Ann (CPSO#: 94060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Galaxy 12 Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Concurrent Youth Unit
CAMH
80 Workman Way - 4th floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 39100
Fax: (416) 583-1205
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kindercare Pediatrics
491 Eglington Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-848-7665
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave, Toronto, ON
M5G 1X8
Toronto ON  M5G1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Tulloch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tulloch ( CPSO# 94060 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Galaxy 12 Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
80 Workman Way
4rth Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8

Business Address:
201 Chester Le Boulevard
Toronto ON  M1W 2K7

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHA DEE-ANN TULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014