Tung, Amy Shiu Lai (CPSO#: 88946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Tung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tung ( CPSO# 88946 )

Business Address:
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 3G8
Phone Number: (905) 726-9755

Business Address:
50 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4N7
Phone Number: (905) 762-2090


Corporation Name: Jonathan H. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tung ( CPSO# 88946 )
Dr. J. Lai ( CPSO# 89331 )

Business Address:
Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY SHIU LAI TUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010