Tunks, Marcel Gabriel (CPSO#: 81272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
T2127
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: 9055216183
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCEL GABRIEL TUNKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008