Turashvili, Gulisa (CPSO#: 95210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tbilisi Medical Institute, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Laboratory
Medicine
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GULISA TURASHVILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURASHVILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018