Turchin, Kathrin (CPSO#: 90890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto West Medical
523 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Y 1J7
Phone: (416) 760-8367
Fax: (416) 760-7212
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathrin Turchin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Turchin ( CPSO# 90890 )

Business Address:
Toronto West Medical
523 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Y 1J7
Phone Number: (416) 760-8367

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRIN TURCHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURCHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011