Tureanu, Valentin Ioan (CPSO#: 78521)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2009