Turlapati, Padmini Narayana (CPSO#: 56591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:University of Delhi, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 OR File Bank Record Centre 488 Carlingview Drive Etobicoke, ON M9W 6M8 Tel: 416 798 1404
Date Received: 14 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PADMINI NARAYANA TURLAPATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURLAPATI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991