Turner, Marci Robyn (CPSO#: 86590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone: (416) 773-0220
Fax: (416) 773-0507
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Diabetes Clinic
The Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Turner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Turner ( CPSO# 33200 )
Dr. M. Turner ( CPSO# 86590 )

Business Address:
Weston Medical Centre
1953 Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 248-5539

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCI ROBYN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2011